MD SB656 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide reimbursement for certain services for the treatment of prediabetes and obesity; requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain equipment, supplies, training, and services for the treatment of elevated or impaired blood glucose levels induced by pregnancy or prediabetes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity Treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-04-04HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-30HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2018-03-30HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {837172/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback