MD SB656 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning October 1, 2011, the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to post a specified Energy Star rating for specified county or municipal buildings in a specified area of the buildings; and beginning on specified dates, requiring the Department of General Services to post a specified Energy Star rating for specified State buildings in a specified area of the buildings.
Title
Energy Performance Ratings - State, County, and Municipal Buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Counties
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Signs and Billboards
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Signs and Billboards
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0656.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0656f.pdf |