MD SB655 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the period that constitutes an extended benefit period and when a State "on" indicator exists; specifying the total amount of certain extended unemployment benefits that are payable to an eligible individual; authorizing the Secretary of Labor, if authorized by federal law, to suspend the payment of certain extended unemployment benefits; and establishing that federal unemployment law provisions and definitions related to extended benefits apply to a certain extent.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Federal Extended Benefits for Long-Term Unemployment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-40) |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB253 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Subjects
Data
dependents
Emergencies
Federal Government
Insurance
Time
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Weights and Measures
dependents
Emergencies
Federal Government
Insurance
Time
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 8 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 1110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |