MD SB650 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the population formula used to determine the number of Class A alcoholic beverages licenses that may be issued in an election district in Frederick County.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Population
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB768 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-04 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Demographics
Frederick County
Jurisdiction
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Demographics
Frederick County
Jurisdiction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |