MD SB650 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to convene a workgroup to evaluate the establishment of a regional waste disposal facility to serve Anne Arundel County, Baltimore City, Baltimore County, Carroll County, Harford County, and Howard County; providing for the composition of the workgroup; and requiring the workgroup to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021.
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1094 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Carroll County
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Environmental Service, Maryland
Examinations
Harford County
Howard County
Industry and Technology
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Zoning and Planning
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Carroll County
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Environmental Service, Maryland
Examinations
Harford County
Howard County
Industry and Technology
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Zoning and Planning
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0650?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0650f.pdf |