MD SB650 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include specified individuals serving in specified positions in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; providing that specified members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who meet specified criteria may receive a normal service retirement allowance that is based on specified creditable service; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 689 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {719038/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Correctional Officers
Credit
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Time
Correctional Officers
Credit
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Time