MD SB65 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Jan 17 @ 10:30 am Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Including income from certain retirement plans within a certain subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain individuals; altering the calculation of the subtraction modification; increasing the maximum amount of the subtraction modification allowed for certain taxable years; and prohibiting an individual from qualifying for the subtraction if the total income from all qualified retirement plans for the taxable year exceeds $100,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateHearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
2019-01-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-17SenateHearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-07-13SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback