MD SB65 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the State Board of Common Ownership Community Managers in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation for purposes of regulating common ownership community property management services in the State; providing for the composition of the Board; providing that the Act does not prohibit certain persons from providing services under certain circumstances; requiring an individual to be issued a license by the Board before providing management services for a common ownership community under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/11 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Budget and Management, Department of
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Condominiums
Contracts
Examinations
Fees
General Assembly
Homeowners Associations
Interest
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Names
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Budget and Management, Department of
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Condominiums
Contracts
Examinations
Fees
General Assembly
Homeowners Associations
Interest
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Names
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations