MD SB649 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a certain share of the net estate of the decedent instead of the property left to the surviving spouse under the will; providing that a surviving spouse may take a certain elective share amount of a certain estate subject to election; establishing the priority to be used in determining the sources from which a certain elective share amount is payable; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {788977/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Beneficiaries
Circuit Courts
Contracts
Counties
Disabilities
Disclosure
Divorce
Estate Tax
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Jurisdiction
Minors
Notices
Orphans' Court
Personal Representatives
Petitions
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Time
Beneficiaries
Circuit Courts
Contracts
Counties
Disabilities
Disclosure
Divorce
Estate Tax
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Jurisdiction
Minors
Notices
Orphans' Court
Personal Representatives
Petitions
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Time