MD SB649 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a specified local telephone company provide "lifeline" to qualifying low-income consumers under specified circumstances; repealing a requirement that a telephone company charge an eligible subscriber a percentage of a specified tariff under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Human Resources to provide specified information to local telephone companies to the extent allowed by State law in addition to federal law and until specified eligibility is determined; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-22 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {807274/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Federal Government
Human Resources, Department of
Indigent Persons
Prices
Telephones
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Federal Government
Human Resources, Department of
Indigent Persons
Prices
Telephones
Utilities
Utility Regulation