MD SB649 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to verify specified information before accrediting an individual to engage in an asbestos occupation; altering the circumstances under which a penalty may be composed; increasing the maximum penalty that may be imposed for specified violations to $25,000; establishing the Asbestos Worker Protection Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring payment of specified penalties and fines into the Fund; specifying the use of the Fund; etc.
Title
Environment - Asbestos Worker Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Jacobs) {753920/1 Rejected (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Jacobs) {753920/1 Rejected (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (116-22) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) 753920/1 Rejected (9-36) | |
2012-03-17 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) 463723/2 Withdrawn | |
2012-03-16 | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) 463723/2 | |
2012-03-16 | Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) 463723/2 | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 884131/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 884131/1 | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Asbestos
Environment, Department of
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Health
Interest
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Work, Labor and Employment
Environment, Department of
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Health
Interest
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Work, Labor and Employment