MD SB649 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Re-referred Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Re-referred Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that specified residential dwelling structures offered for lease to individuals who are 55 years or older and that are constructed or improved with the addition or alteration of heating, ventilitation, or air conditioning using State money on or after October 1, 2011, be equipped with an air-conditioning system that meets specified requirements; and requiring specified air-conditioning systems to be in compliance with specified codes.
Title
Real Property - Dwellings Leased to Individuals Age 55 or Older -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-09 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-03 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |