MD SB647 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to provide certain reports on federal COVID-19 relief funding; requiring the reports to be submitted on or before March 15, 2021, and quarterly through June 30, 2022; requiring the reports to identify any unmet funding needs of the State in responding to the COVID-19 pandemic and establish a plan to allocate additional federal funding received by the State; etc.
Title
Federal COVID-19 Relief Funding - Report
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Melony Griffith [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {789230/1 Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
CARES Act
COVID-19
Emergency Bills
Federal Aid
Operating Budget
Reports
CARES Act
COVID-19
Emergency Bills
Federal Aid
Operating Budget
Reports