MD SB646 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for certain decedents; altering a certain limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2019; providing that, for the calculation of the Maryland estate tax in the case of a certain decedent spouse, the applicable exclusion amount includes the sum of a certain exclusion amount and a certain deceased spousal unused exclusion amount; etc.
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-9) (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-9) (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-49) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-9) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {709133/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |