MD SB64 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Labor to waive the charging of unemployment insurance benefits paid to a claimant during the state of emergency declared by the Governor due to the COVID-19 pandemic against the earned rating record of an employing unit; specifying the circumstances under which the required waiver of benefit charges is no longer in effect; and terminating the Act 1 year from the date on which the state of emergency declared by the Governor due to the COVID-19 pandemic ends.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 8 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |