MD SB637 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the due date, from September 1 to November 1, of specified annual reports on the county hotel rental tax revenue distribution; repealing specified reporting requirements relating to the county hotel rental tax revenue; requiring the Washington County Commissioners to post a report on the hotel rental tax revenue on the county's Web site; and requiring the Hagerstown/Washington County Convention and Visitors Bureau to report to the County Commissioners on its use of the hotel rental tax revenue.
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609330/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Electronic Government
Hagerstown
Hotels and Motels
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Washington County
County Commissioners
Electronic Government
Hagerstown
Hotels and Motels
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Washington County