MD SB630 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Office of Resilience in the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; requiring the Secretary of Emergency Management to appoint a Chief Resilience Officer to direct the Office of Resilience; and requiring the Office of Resilience to coordinate with appropriate State agencies and State entities to meet certain goals.
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-10) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {993724/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB706 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Agriculture
Building Codes
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
emermand
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Service, Maryland
Flood Control
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Labor, Department of
Loans
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources, Department of
Poverty
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Officials
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sediment Control
Shore Erosion
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation, Department of
Weather
Building Codes
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
emermand
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Service, Maryland
Flood Control
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Labor, Department of
Loans
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources, Department of
Poverty
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Officials
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sediment Control
Shore Erosion
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation, Department of
Weather
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 14 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |