MD SB629 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each local correctional facility and each correctional facility in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to have a policy in place regarding the medical care of pregnant inmates that addresses certain matters including access to child placement resources; requiring the managing official of each facility to provide the written policy to an inmate at the time of a positive pregnancy test; requiring the Maryland Commission on Correctional Standards to review each correctional facility's policy; etc.
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-15) (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-7) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-7) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-15) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-7) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {478977/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {478977/1 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abortion
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Correctional Institutions
Counselors
Foster Care
Health
Pregnancy
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reproductive Matters
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Correctional Institutions
Counselors
Foster Care
Health
Pregnancy
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reproductive Matters