MD SB629 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the authority of the Department of Natural Resources to allow deer hunting on specified Sundays does not apply in Kent County; and authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt deer on private property on Sundays in Kent County throughout all deer hunting seasons, subject to specified provisions of law and specified time restrictions.
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {164838/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |