MD SB629 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Director of Human Resources of Kent County to request from the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services a State and national criminal history records check for a prospective county employee or volunteer; requiring that the Director submit sets of fingerprints and fees to the Central Repository as part of the application for a criminal history records check; etc.
Title
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Fees
Fingerprinting
Kent County
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Volunteers
Criminal Law - Procedure
Fees
Fingerprinting
Kent County
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Volunteers