MD SB628 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide coverage for sports physicals performed by school-based health centers; requiring the Secretary of Health to include certain infrastructure needs in guidelines on the expansion of school-based health centers; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before January 1, 2024, to develop a certain school-based health center funding allocation formula and a certain budget proposal.
Title
School-Based Health Centers - Services, Infrastructure, and Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Data
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 22A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 22A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 22A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |