MD SB625 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to make available to specified service providers, local administering agencies for specified service providers and county boards of education specified supplies of feminine hygiene products for female residents in shelters and specified homeless female students; requiring specified feminine hygiene products to be made available free; requiring each county board of education to make available, in a specified manner, feminine hygiene products to homeless female students; etc.
Title
Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {835865/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {817972/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Education, Boards of
Health
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Indigent Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Social Services - Generally
Students
Women
Counties
Education, Boards of
Health
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Indigent Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Social Services - Generally
Students
Women