MD SB624 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified information that a title insurer is required to include in specified disclosures; providing that a title insurance commitment or a specified sample form constitutes a specified written statement, is not a representation as to the state of title, and does not constitute a specified abstract; requiring a specified title insurance commitment or sample form to contain a specified statement; etc.
Title
Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {957272/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Finance |