MD SB621 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to identify and license certain independent evaluators to evaluate and rate certain sports wagering content provided by sports wagering experts, sports wagering influencers, and content partners; authorizing the Commission and the Sports Wagering Application Review Commission to consider a request to amend a Class B-2 sports wagering facility license application for the purpose of altering the proposed location of the facility under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering - Independent Evaluation of Sports Wagering Content and Sports Wagering Facility Application Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 106 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 106 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (106-30) |
2023-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment {943722/1 (Chair, Ways and Means Committee) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment {973922/1 (Delegate Adams) Adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903128/1 Adopted |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {603029/1 Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Contracts
Ethics
Gaming
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Sports and Recreation
Standards and Best Practices
Contracts
Ethics
Gaming
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Sports and Recreation
Standards and Best Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 1E-17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |