MD SB621 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain persons to execute and record a restrictive covenant modification to an unlawfully restrictive covenant in a certain manner; requiring the governing body of a homeowners association to delete any recorded covenant or restriction that restricts ownership based on race, religious belief, or national origin from the common area deeds or other declarations of property in the development on or before September 30, 2019; etc.
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {190311/3 Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {488772/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Contracts
Discrimination
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Human Relations
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Real Property
Recordation
Records
Sunset
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Contracts
Discrimination
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Human Relations
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Real Property
Recordation
Records
Sunset