MD SB620 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting institutions of higher education from entering into a contract with a certain regulated gaming entity or a certain agent of a regulated gaming entity if the institution of higher education receives certain compensation for student participation in certain sports wagering; prohibiting institutions of higher education from entering into a contract with a sports marketing entity if the entity or the institution receives certain compensation for student participation in certain sports wagering; etc.
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Sports Wagering Contracts - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-04-04 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred Ways and Means Appropriations |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {193028/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB802 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Subjects
Contracts
Gaming
Higher Education
internet
Mobile Devices
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Students
Gaming
Higher Education
internet
Mobile Devices
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1E-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |