MD SB618 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removing a certain type of hydraulic elevator in a privately owned building from a requirement for a certain test; requiring, beginning October 1, 2022, a certain annual test on a certain type of hydraulic elevator in a privately owned building be performed by a licensed elevator mechanic in the presence of a third-party qualified elevator inspector; altering a certain date to October 1, 2021 on which certain elevator inspections are required to begin; and requiring the Secretary of Labor to make certain reports; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Hydraulic Elevator Inspections - Privately Owned Buildings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1507 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 12 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |