MD SB618 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency to provide a retiring law enforcement officer or specified retired law enforcement officer with an identification card under specified circumstances; authorizing a law enforcement agency to charge a reasonable fee for an identification card or a replacement card; requiring a law enforcement officer to meet specified requirements to qualify for an identification card; establishing the form and contents of an identification card; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {712211/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Fees
Identification
Law Enforcement
Photography
Public Safety
Sheriffs
Signatures
State Police, Department of
Identification
Law Enforcement
Photography
Public Safety
Sheriffs
Signatures
State Police, Department of