MD SB617 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State's Attorney Case Management System Grant Fund to provide grants to State's Attorneys' offices to establish or improve case management systems; altering the membership of the Task Force to Study Transparency Standards for State's Attorneys; making the reporting requirement for the Task Force an annual report; and altering the termination date of the Task Force to June 30, 2027.
Title
Task Force to Study Transparency Standards for State's Attorneys and the State's Attorney Case Management System Grant Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedures
Electronic Government
Grants
Interest
Legislative Services, Department of
Open Government
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State's Attorneys
Sunset
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedures
Electronic Government
Grants
Interest
Legislative Services, Department of
Open Government
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State's Attorneys
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Criminal Procedure | 15 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 15 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 15 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0617?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0617f.pdf |