MD SB616 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Study the Retirement of Judges; providing for the membership and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Governor to designate a chair of the Commission; establishing that the members of the Commission may not receive compensation but are entitled to a specified reimbursement; establishing the duties of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Commission to Study the Retirement of Judges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Favorable Adopted (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Favorable Adopted (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) 803127/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-18 | Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Getty) Adopted | |
2012-03-17 | Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted | |
2012-03-17 | Floor Committee Amendment (Judicial Proceedings) 898971/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable Report Adopted (26-20) | |
2012-03-16 | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable | |
2012-03-13 | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Constitutional Amendments
Education
Judges
Legislative Services, Department of
Mandatory Retirement
Referendum
Reports
Sunset
Constitutional Amendments
Education
Judges
Legislative Services, Department of
Mandatory Retirement
Referendum
Reports
Sunset