MD SB615 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a State contribution to a Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan may be made to a limited number of accounts for each qualified beneficiary; limiting, for State contribution application periods after December 31, 2020, a qualified beneficiary from receiving more than two State contributions for each year the qualified beneficiary is eligible for the State contribution; authorizing the Maryland 529 Board to adopt certain regulations; and requiring a certain report to the General Assembly.
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {723223/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {894231/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {894231/1 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB532 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Investments
Rules and Regulations
Time
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Investments
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 19A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19A-04.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |