MD SB613 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified notice procedures required to enforce a lien on specified property stored in a leased space at a self-service storage facility; requiring a specified agreement to contain a specified statement; establishing that the balance of proceeds from a specified sale is presumed abandoned under specified circumstances; and altering specified procedures required for the administration of specified proceeds from a specified sale.
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {477676/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Leases and Rent
Liens
News Media
Notices
Personal Property
Postal Service
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Leases and Rent
Liens
News Media
Notices
Personal Property
Postal Service
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology