MD SB613 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual who files an income tax return electronically to elect to use all or a portion of the individual's income tax refund to purchase U.S. Series I Savings Bonds; specifying that the individual must make the designation in $50 increments; requiring the Comptroller to send any remaining portion of the individual's refund to the individual; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Title
Income Tax - Electronic Filing - Designation to Purchase Federal Savings Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-1) |
2013-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |