MD SB612 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination provision of a certain provision of law relating to the annual certification of the amount of assessable base for certain real property for the purposes of calculating certain State education aid.
Title
State Education Aid - Tax Increment Financing Development Districts - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-2) (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-2) |
2018-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |