MD SB612 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from committing an assault by applying pressure on the throat or neck of another person in a specified manner; and establishing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of the felony of assault in the first degree and on conviction is subject to a specified penalty.
Title
Criminal Law - First Degree Assault - Strangulation
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Joseph Getty [R] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Norman Stone [D] | Sen. Robert Zirkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |