MD SB610 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy to study and review certain issues related to certain changes to forested lands in the State due to certain circumstances; requiring the Task Force to develop findings and recommendations regarding forest conservation in Maryland and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; authorizing the Task Force to consult with the Chesapeake Bay Program, the U.S. Forest Service, and certain governmental entities and academic institutions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-36) (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29) (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)
2018-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {840312/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-04-04HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2018-03-29HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (36-10)
2018-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-27SenateFloor Amendment {823624/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
2018-03-27SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted
2018-03-27SenateFloor Amendment {183425/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2018-03-27SenateFloor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) Adopted
2018-03-27SenateMotion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29)
2018-03-27SenateFloor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)
2018-03-26SenateLaid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2018-03-26SenateFloor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)
2018-03-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26SenateCommittee Amendment Withdrawn
2018-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {994034/1
2018-03-19SenateSpecial Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted
2018-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {994034/1
2018-03-16SenateSpecial Order until 3/19 (Senator Young) Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {994034/1
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-20SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0610&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0610f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0610t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0610_99403401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0610_90372901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0610_18342501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0610_82362401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0610_84031201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0610.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0610_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0847.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0863.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0610_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1429.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback