MD SB61 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring telephone companies and commercial mobile radio service (CMRS) providers to keep records of 9-1-1 fees collected and remitted for at least 4 years after the fees are remitted; requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Emergency Number Systems Board, to adopt procedures for auditing surcharge collection and remittance by telephones companies and CMRS providers; providing the Comptroller is entitled to .5% of the fees to cover the expense of conducting audits; authorizing the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {119534/1 Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Comptroller
Credit
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Emergency Services
Fees
Privacy
Public Safety
Radio
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Telephones
Utility Regulation
Comptroller
Credit
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Emergency Services
Fees
Privacy
Public Safety
Radio
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Telephones
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 13 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |