MD SB61 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a specified coverage requirement that applies to specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations includes coverage for digital tomosynthesis, a radiologic breast cancer screening procedure, under specified circumstances; prohibiting a copayment or coinsurance requirement that is greater than for other breast cancer screenings; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {887675/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-10-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Diseases
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients