MD SB61 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that appellate review of final judgments in specified criminal proceedings be sought by application for leave to appeal.
Title
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appeals
Attorney General
Circuit Courts
Court of Special Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Judgments
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
State's Attorneys
Attorney General
Circuit Courts
Court of Special Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Judgments
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
State's Attorneys