MD SB61 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a local licensing agency, under specified circumstances, to issue a temporary kennel license to a specified individual who owns or keeps the maximum number of dogs allowed without a kennel license and seeks to keep and care for a dog owned by another individual who is serving on active duty in the armed forces of the United States.
Title
Counties - Temporary Kennel License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn | |
2012-01-23 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-01-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0061.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0061f.pdf |