MD SB609 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified county boards of education to inform the county commissioners or the county council if specified land, schools sites, or buildings have been determined by the county board to be no longer needed for school purposes under specified circumstances; requiring a county board to inform public charter schools in the county if school sites or buildings have been determined by the county board to be no longer needed for school purposes under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Charter Schools - School Sites and Buildings - Availability for
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] |
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Charters
Counties
County Commissioners
County Councils
Education, Boards of
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Property Tax
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Real Property
Counties
County Commissioners
County Councils
Education, Boards of
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Property Tax
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Real Property