MD SB608 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program to include Baltimore City and individuals under mandatory supervision; and extending the termination date of the program for 2 years until September 30, 2017.
Title
Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Ex-Offenders
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Ex-Offenders
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset