MD SB607 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured who becomes a surviving spouse based solely on the insured's change in marital status.
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Status as Surviving Spouse
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Hester [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {367771/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |