MD SB607 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-11)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use Disorders; specifying the purposes of the Joint Committee are to review the final report of the Governor's Heroin and Opioid Emergency Task Force, review and monitor the activities of the Governor's Inter-Agency Heroin and Opioid Coordinating Council, monitor the effectiveness of specified programs, policies, and practices, review compliance with specified federal and State laws by health insurance carriers, and identify areas of concern and corrective measures; etc.
Title
Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {676289/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {447977/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Emergency Medical Services
General Assembly
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Legislative Services, Department of
Mental Health
Public Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Emergency Medical Services
General Assembly
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Legislative Services, Department of
Mental Health
Public Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Sunset