MD SB605 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county superintendent to allow a child to remain at a specified school under specified circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Human Resources and the Secretary of Juvenile Services each to adopt regulations establishing factors relating to the best interests of specified children; requiring the State Department of Education to adopt specified regulations to implement specified provisions of a specified federal law; etc.
Title
Education - Domicile Requirements for Attendance - Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-1) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments 715464/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 734834/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments 734834/1 | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/15 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Child Care
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Foster Care
Group Homes
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Immunization
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Students
Transportation
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Foster Care
Group Homes
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Immunization
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Students
Transportation