MD SB604 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a parent or legal guardian of a medical cannabis patient under the age of 18 years to designate not more than two additional adults to be a caregiver, in addition to the parent or legal guardian; specifying that the definition of "caregiver" does not include designated school personnel; authorizing a qualified patient under the age of 18 years to obtain medical cannabis from certain designated school personnel; exempting certain caregivers and school personnel from certain penalties related to the administration of cannabis; etc.
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools – Medical Cannabis – Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina’s Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-3) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {614030/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB617 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
Subjects
Cannabis
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Minors
Notices
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
School Buses
Storage
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theft
Time
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Minors
Notices
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
School Buses
Storage
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theft
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 446 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |