MD SB602 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB574
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Jobs Court Pilot Program in the District Court sitting in Baltimore City to reduce recidivism by offering defendants an opportunity to participate in full-time job training and job placement programs as a condition of probation, an alternative to incarceration, or a condition of pretrial release; and requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to take certain actions including providing a certain report, in consultation with the Baltimore Workforce Development Board, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB574 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary
HB785 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
HB785 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Criminal Law - Procedures
District Courts
General Assembly
Governor
Job Training
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Criminal Law - Procedures
District Courts
General Assembly
Governor
Job Training
Parole and Probation
Pretrial Detention or Release
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0602?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0602f.pdf |