MD SB601 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "food service facility" to exclude the regulation of certain micro markets as food service facilities by the Maryland Department of Health.
Title
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Regulation as Food Service Facility - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1605 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 17 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |