MD SB601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the composition of a scenic river advisory board in Carroll County if the scenic or wild river for which the board was created flows through Carroll County and one or more other counties.
Title
Carroll County – Scenic River Advisory Board – Composition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Carroll County
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Carroll County
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes