MD SB600 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from receiving certain equipment from a program operated by the federal government for the transfer of surplus military equipment; requiring a law enforcement agency to notify the Independent Investigative Unit in the Office of the Attorney General of an alleged or potential police-involved death of a civilian by a certain time; establishing the Independent Investigative Unit in the Office of the Attorney General to investigate alleged or potential police-involved deaths of civilians; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment and Investigation of Deaths Caused by Police Officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Saab) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - House - Floor Amendment 883126/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - House - Floor Amendment 723127/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (31-16)
2021-04-07SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (98-39)
2021-04-05HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-93)
2021-04-05HouseFloor Amendment {883126/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-91)
2021-04-05HouseFloor Amendment {723127/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (45-91)
2021-04-05HouseFloor Committee Amendment {603029/1 Adopted
2021-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01HouseMotion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (41-93)
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {602810/1 Adopted
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-04-01HouseHearing canceled
2021-04-01HouseHearing 4/01 at 2:30 p.m.
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-04HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-03-03SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-02SenateCommittee Amendment {958077/1 Adopted
2021-02-26SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {958077/1
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-01-29SenateHearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government6106.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0600?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0600f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0600t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0600e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0600_95807701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0600_60281001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0600_72312701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0600_60302901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0600_88312601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0600_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0600_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0325.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0960.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1065.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1066.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1067.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1068.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0975.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback